Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jules Cléret

Deceased

Bishop of Laval


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Dec 1835BornCarentan
1 Jun 186024.4Ordained PriestPriest
28 Aug 188953.7SelectedBishop of Laval, France
30 Dec 188954.0ConfirmedBishop of Laval, France
16 Feb 189054.1Ordained BishopBishop of Laval, France
23 Feb 189054.2InstalledBishop of Laval, France
23 Jan 189559.1DiedBishop of Laval, France

MicroData Summary for Jules Cléret:
Bishop Jules Cléret (born , died ) Bishop of Laval

  • a priest for 34.6 years
  • a bishop for 4.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: LC
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 580

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013