Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jacques-Louis Daniel

Deceased

Bishop of Coutances (-Avranches)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Jan 1794BornContrières
5 Jun 181925.3Ordained PriestPriest
7 Jan 185358.9SelectedBishop of Coutances, France
7 Mar 185359.1ConfirmedBishop of Coutances, France
12 Jun 185359.4Ordained BishopBishop of Coutances, France
4 Jul 186268.4DiedBishop of Coutances (-Avranches), France

MicroData Summary for Jacques-Louis Daniel (VIAF: 76394764)
Bishop Jacques-Louis Daniel (born , died ) Bishop of Coutances (-Avranches)

  • a priest for 43.0 years
  • a bishop for 9.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: LC
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 222
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1853, Number 22

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 27 Dec 2016