Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Marie-Joseph Ollivier

Deceased

Bishop of Ajaccio, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Nov 1843Born
6 Jun 186824.5Ordained PriestPriest
21 Feb 190662.2AppointedBishop of Ajaccio, France
25 Feb 190662.2Ordained BishopBishop of Ajaccio, France
21 Mar 190662.3DiedBishop of Ajaccio, France

MicroData Summary for Marie-Joseph Ollivier
Bishop Marie-Joseph Ollivier (born , died ) Bishop of Ajaccio

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMarseille

  • a priest for 37.7 years
  • a bishop for .0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 9, Page 36
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1906, Number 9

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018