Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Eugène-François Touzet

Deceased

Bishop of Aire et Dax


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Jan 1842BornCouret
1869¹26.9Ordained PriestPriest
21 Feb 190664.1AppointedBishop of Aire et Dax, France
25 Feb 190664.1Ordained BishopBishop of Aire et Dax, France
23 Sep 191169.7DiedBishop of Aire et Dax, France

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Eugène-François Touzet:
Bishop Eugène-François Touzet (born , died ) Bishop of Aire et Dax

  • a priest for 42.7 years
  • a bishop for 5.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: LC
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 9, Page 72
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1906, Number 11

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013