Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Patriarch Marco Condulmer

Deceased

Titular Patriarch of Alexandria {Alessandria}


Events

DateEventTitle
9 Jan 1432AppointedBishop of Avignon, France
4 Nov 1433AppointedArchbishop of Tarentaise (Moûtiers-en-Tarentaise), France
28 Feb 1438AppointedPatriarch of Grado, Italy
1444²AppointedTitular Patriarch of Alexandria {Alessandria}

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Marco Condulmer
Patriarch Marco Condulmer , Titular Patriarch of Alexandria {Alessandria}

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 245, and Page 100
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 160, and Page 85

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.4, 3 Mar 2019; Data: 19 Sep 2019

Quantcast