Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Giovanni de Compesio (Compeys)

Deceased

Archbishop of Tarentaise (Moûtiers-en-Tarentaise)


Events

DateEventTitle
21 Nov 1469AppointedBishop of Torino, Italy
10 Dec 1469Ordained BishopBishop of Torino, Italy
24 Jul 1482AppointedBishop of Genève {Geneva}, Switzerland
14 Jun 1484AppointedArchbishop of Tarentaise (Moûtiers-en-Tarentaise), France
28 Jun 1492DiedArchbishop of Tarentaise (Moûtiers-en-Tarentaise), France

MicroData Summary for Giovanni de Compesio (Compeys):
Archbishop Giovanni de Compesio (Compeys) (died ) Archbishop of Tarentaise (Moûtiers-en-Tarentaise)

  • a bishop for 22.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 2, Page 247, and Page 158
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 2, Page 245
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 118, Number 10,506
  • b/c2: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1469, Number 10
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 210, Number 17,295

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013