Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop François Amédée Milliet de Challes

Deceased

Archbishop of Tarentaise (Moûtiers-en-Tarentaise), France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Sep 1623Born
17 Nov 165936.2AppointedArchbishop of Tarentaise (Moûtiers-en-Tarentaise), France
25 May 170379.7DiedArchbishop of Tarentaise (Moûtiers-en-Tarentaise), France

MicroData Summary for François Amédée Milliet de Challes
Archbishop François Amédée Milliet de Challes (born , died ) Archbishop of Tarentaise (Moûtiers-en-Tarentaise)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceChambery

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 327
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1659, Number 53

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018