Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Domenico Cardinal della Rovere

Deceased

Bishop of Corneto (Tarquinia) e Montefiascone, Italy

Cardinal-Priest of San Clemente

Archbishop (Personal Title) of Torino


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1442²Born
10 Feb 147836.1AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Vitale
10 Feb 147836.1Elevated to Cardinal
11 Feb 147836.1AppointedArchbishop of Tarentaise (Moûtiers-en-Tarentaise), France
24 Aug 147836.6AppointedArchbishop (Personal Title) of Corneto (Tarquinia) e Montefiascone, Italy
13 Aug 147937.6AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Clemente
19 Jul 148240.5AppointedArchbishop (Personal Title) of Genève {Geneva}, Switzerland
24 Jul 148240.5AppointedArchbishop (Personal Title) of Torino, Italy
22 Apr 150159.3DiedBishop of Corneto (Tarquinia) e Montefiascone, Italy

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Domenico della Rovere (VIAF: 23077771)
Domenico Cardinal della Rovere (born 1442, died ) Bishop of Corneto (Tarquinia) e Montefiascone

EventPlace
Birth PlaceTorino, Diocese of Torino
Death PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a cardinal for 23.1 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 10 Feb 1478
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 138, and Page 158
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 247
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1478, Number 33*

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.2.2, 14 Oct 2018; Data: 27 Nov 2018

Quantcast