Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Louis-Antoine-Augustin Pavy

Deceased

Bishop of Alger, Algeria


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Mar 1805Born
13 Jun 182924.2Ordained PriestPriest
11 Mar 184640.9SelectedBishop of Alger, Algeria
16 Apr 184641.0ConfirmedBishop of Alger, Algeria
24 May 184641.1Ordained BishopBishop of Alger, Algeria
16 Nov 186661.6DiedBishop of Alger, Algeria

MicroData Summary for Louis-Antoine-Augustin Pavy (VIAF: 5065160)
Bishop Louis-Antoine-Augustin Pavy (born , died ) Bishop of Alger

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRoanne, France

  • a priest for 37.4 years
  • a bishop for 20.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 68
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1846, Number 21

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 29 Jan 2017