Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Bénigne-Urbain-Jean-Marie du Trousset d’Héricourt

Deceased

Bishop of Autun


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Jul 1797BornQuestembert
28 May 182527.9Ordained PriestPriest
27 Apr 182931.8SelectedBishop of Autun, France
27 Jul 182932.0ConfirmedBishop of Autun, France
6 Sep 182932.1Ordained BishopBishop of Autun, France
11 Oct 182932.2InstalledBishop of Autun, France
8 Jul 185154.0DiedBishop of Autun, France

MicroData Summary for Bénigne-Urbain-Jean-Marie du Trousset d’Héricourt:
Bishop Bénigne-Urbain-Jean-Marie du Trousset d’Héricourt (born , died ) Bishop of Autun

  • a priest for 26.1 years
  • a bishop for 21.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: LC
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 60

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.6, 1 Jan 2014; data: 10 Jan 2014