Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jean-François Croizier

Deceased

Bishop of Rodez


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Nov 1787BornBillom
5 Apr 181729.4Ordained PriestPriest
17 Mar 184254.3SelectedBishop of Rodez, France
23 May 184254.5ConfirmedBishop of Rodez, France
25 Jul 184254.7Ordained BishopBishop of Rodez, France
2 Apr 185567.4DiedBishop of Rodez, France

MicroData Summary for Jean-François Croizier (VIAF: 12299400)
Bishop Jean-François Croizier (born , died ) Bishop of Rodez

  • a priest for 37.9 years
  • a bishop for 12.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: LC
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 328
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1842, Number 41

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 25 Nov 2016