Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Antoine de Pons de La Grange

Deceased

Bishop of Moulins


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Mar 1759BornRiom
19 Apr 178324.0Ordained PriestPriest
10 Apr 182364.0SelectedBishop of Moulins, France
16 May 182364.1ConfirmedBishop of Moulins, France
13 Jul 182364.2Ordained BishopBishop of Moulins, France
5 Sep 182364.4InstalledBishop of Moulins, France
23 Sep 184990.4DiedBishop of Moulins, France

MicroData Summary for Antoine de Pons de La Grange (VIAF: 88812754)
Bishop Antoine de Pons de La Grange (born , died ) Bishop of Moulins

  • a priest for 66.4 years
  • a bishop for 26.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: LC
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 268
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1823, Number 30

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 25 Nov 2016