Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Luciano Saracani, O.F.M. Obs. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Poggio Mirteto, Italy

Titular Bishop of Epiphania in Cilicia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Nov 1821Born
1 Sep 183917.7ProfessedMember of Order of Observant Friars Minor
29 Sep 184422.8Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Observant Friars Minor
27 Mar 188260.3AppointedBishop of Poggio Mirteto, Italy
2 Apr 188260.3Ordained BishopBishop of Poggio Mirteto, Italy
1 Jun 188866.5ResignedBishop of Poggio Mirteto, Italy
1 Jun 188866.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Epiphania in Cilicia
23 Aug 189270.7DiedBishop Emeritus of Poggio Mirteto, Italy

MicroData Summary for Luciano Saracani (VIAF: 289942719)
Bishop Luciano Saracani O.F.M. Obs. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Poggio Mirteto

EventPlace
Birth PlaceGreccio
Ordained BishopSanta Maria in Ara Coeli, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a priest for 47.9 years
  • a bishop for 10.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: LC
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1885
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 261, and Page 362
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1882, Number 17

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 21 May 2017