Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Vincenzo Brancia

Deceased

Bishop of Ugento, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Jan 1818Born
4 Apr 184022.1Ordained DeaconDeacon
19 Dec 184022.8Ordained PriestPriest
25 Jun 188971.4AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Ugento, Italy
25 Jun 188971.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Amathus in Cypro
29 Jun 188971.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Amathus in Cypro
26 Jul 189072.4SucceededBishop of Ugento, Italy
25 Apr 189678.2DiedBishop of Ugento, Italy

MicroData Summary for Vincenzo Brancia (VIAF: 88355051)
Bishop Vincenzo Brancia (born , died ) Bishop of Ugento

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNicotera, Diocese of Nicotera e Tropea
Ordained BishopS. Antonio-Via Merulana, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a priest for 55.3 years
  • a bishop for 6.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 93, and Page 574
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1889, Number 35

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 21 May 2017