Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ludovic-Henri-Marie-Ixile Julien-Laferrière

Deceased

Bishop of Constantine (-Hippone), Algeria


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Sep 1838Born
11 Apr 186829.5Ordained PriestPriest
29 Jan 189455.3SelectedBishop of Constantine (-Hippone), Algeria
18 May 189455.6ConfirmedBishop of Constantine (-Hippone), Algeria
25 Jul 189455.8Ordained BishopBishop of Constantine (-Hippone), Algeria
12 Aug 189657.9DiedBishop of Constantine (-Hippone), Algeria

MicroData Summary for Ludovic-Henri-Marie-Ixile Julien-Laferrière
Bishop Ludovic-Henri-Marie-Ixile Julien-Laferrière (born , died ) Bishop of Constantine (-Hippone)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceParis, Archdiocese of Paris, France
Ordained PriestRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Ordained BishopLazaristes, Chapel, Paris, Archdiocese of Paris, France
Death PlaceParis, Archdiocese of Paris, France

  • a priest for 28.3 years
  • a bishop for 2.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c3+: LC
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 223
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1894, Number 36

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 10 Jun 2017