Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jean Louis Mando

Deceased

Bishop of Angoulême


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Sep 1850BornLangast
30 May 187423.7Ordained PriestPriest
7 Dec 189949.2SelectedBishop of Angoulême, France
14 Dec 189949.2ConfirmedBishop of Angoulême, France
25 Mar 190049.5Ordained BishopBishop of Angoulême, France
3 Apr 190049.5InstalledBishop of Angoulême, France
24 Jul 190049.8DiedBishop of Angoulême, France

MicroData Summary for Jean Louis Mando:
Bishop Jean Louis Mando (born , died ) Bishop of Angoulême

  • a priest for 26.2 years
  • a bishop for .3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 260

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013