Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Augustin Prosper Hacquard, M. Afr. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Sahara and Sudan

Titular Bishop of Rusicade


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Sep 1860BornAlbestroff, France
8 Sep 188424.0Ordained PriestPriest of Missionaries of Africa (White Fathers)
19 Jan 189837.3AppointedVicar Apostolic of Sahara and Sudan
19 Jan 189837.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Rusicade
28 Aug 189837.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Rusicade
4 Apr 190140.5DiedVicar Apostolic of Sahara and Sudan

MicroData Summary for Augustin Prosper Hacquard:
Bishop Augustin Prosper Hacquard M. Afr. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of Sahara and Sudan

  • a priest for 16.6 years
  • a bishop for 2.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 489

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013