Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Georges-Marie de Labonninière de Beaumont, C.S.Sp. †

Deceased

Bishop of Saint-Denis-de-La Réunion


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Dec 1872BornIdron, France
17 Apr 189724.3Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Holy Spirit
22 Mar 191744.3AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Saint-Denis-de-La Réunion
22 Mar 191744.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Paphus
14 Oct 191744.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Paphus
26 Dec 191947.0SucceededBishop of Saint-Denis-de-La Réunion
23 Jul 193461.6DiedBishop of Saint-Denis-de-La Réunion

MicroData Summary for Georges-Marie de Labonninière de Beaumont:
Bishop Georges-Marie de Labonninière de Beaumont C.S.Sp. (born , died ) Bishop of Saint-Denis-de-La Réunion

  • a priest for 37.3 years
  • a bishop for 16.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1917, Number 46

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013