Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Honoré-Paul-Émile Halle

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Montpellier (-Lodève-Béziers-Agde-Saint-Pons-de-Thomières)

Titular Archbishop of Cabasa


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Feb 1854BornSête
22 May 188026.2Ordained PriestPriest of Montpellier (-Lodève-Béziers-Agde-Saint-Pons-de-Thomières), France
5 Jun 191662.3AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Montpellier (-Lodève-Béziers-Agde-Saint-Pons-de-Thomières), France
5 Jun 191662.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Pergamum
25 Jul 191662.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Pergamum
21 Dec 192167.8ResignedAuxiliary Bishop of Montpellier (-Lodève-Béziers-Agde-Saint-Pons-de-Thomières), France
23 Jun 192268.3AppointedTitular Archbishop of Cabasa
30 Aug 193480.5DiedAuxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Montpellier (-Lodève-Béziers-Agde-Saint-Pons-de-Thomières), France

MicroData Summary for Honoré-Paul-Émile Halle:
Archbishop Honoré-Paul-Émile Halle (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Montpellier (-Lodève-Béziers-Agde-Saint-Pons-de-Thomières)

  • a priest for 54.3 years
  • a bishop for 18.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: LC
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1916, Number 34

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013