Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Emmanuel Coste

Deceased

Archbishop of Aix (-Arles-Embrun)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Apr 1873BornNarbonne
1898²24.7Ordained PriestPriest
29 Oct 192552.5AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Carcassonne, France
29 Oct 192552.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Flaviopolis
12 Jan 192652.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Flaviopolis
5 Apr 193057.0SucceededBishop of Carcassonne, France
28 Jul 193158.3AppointedArchbishop of Aix (-Arles-Embrun), France
18 Jan 193460.8DiedArchbishop of Aix (-Arles-Embrun), France

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Emmanuel Coste:
Archbishop Emmanuel Coste (born , died ) Archbishop of Aix (-Arles-Embrun)

  • a priest for 36.0 years
  • a bishop for 8.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • op: Annuaire Pontifical Catholique, Year 1932
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1926, Number 5

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013