Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Alexandre-Philibert Poirier

Deceased

Bishop of Tarbes et Lourdes


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Mar 1866BornSaint-Michel-en-l'Herm
31 May 189024.2Ordained PriestPriest
14 Dec 192559.7AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Tarbes et Lourdes, France
14 Dec 192559.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Irenopolis in Cilicia
11 Feb 192659.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Irenopolis in Cilicia
24 Aug 192761.4SucceededBishop of Tarbes et Lourdes, France
25 Aug 192862.4DiedBishop of Tarbes et Lourdes, France

MicroData Summary for Alexandre-Philibert Poirier:
Bishop Alexandre-Philibert Poirier (born , died ) Bishop of Tarbes et Lourdes

  • a priest for 38.2 years
  • a bishop for 2.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: LC
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1926, Number 12

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013