Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Fidèle Agbatchi

Archbishop Emeritus of Parakou


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Oct 1950 BornSavé
7 Jan 197827.2Ordained PriestPriest
14 Apr 200049.5AppointedArchbishop of Parakou, Benin
10 Jun 200049.6Ordained BishopArchbishop of Parakou, Benin
3 Nov 201060.0ResignedArchbishop of Parakou, Benin

MicroData Summary for Fidèle Agbatchi:
Archbishop Fidèle Agbatchi (born ) Archbishop Emeritus of Parakou

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Parakou.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 4 Nov 2010
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 159, Number 13,779
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 194, Deceased Cardinals (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013