Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father François Faroud, S.M.A. †

Deceased

Prefect Emeritus of Parakou

Priest of Society of African Missions


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Jul 1885BornCurtin, France
13 Nov 191025.2Ordained PriestPriest of Society of African Missions
1 May 194256.7AppointedPrefect of Niamey, Niger
21 May 194862.8AppointedPrefect of Parakou, Benin
195670.4ResignedPrefect of Parakou, Benin
5 Sep 196378.1DiedPrefect Emeritus of Parakou, Benin

MicroData Summary for François Faroud:
Father François Faroud S.M.A. (born , died ) Prefect Emeritus of Parakou

  • a priest for 52.8 years

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015