Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Constant Quillard, C.SS.R. †

Deceased

Prefect Emeritus of Niamey, Niger

Priest of Congregation of the Most Holy Redeemer


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 May 1893Born
8 Sep 191219.2ProfessedMember of Congregation of the Most Holy Redeemer
21 Oct 192330.3Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Most Holy Redeemer
15 Jul 194855.1AppointedPrefect of Niamey, Niger
21 Mar 196167.8ResignedPrefect of Niamey, Niger
3 Jun 197279.0DiedPrefect Emeritus of Niamey, Niger

MicroData Summary for Constant Quillard
Father Constant Quillard C.SS.R. (born , died ) Prefect Emeritus of Niamey

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSaint-Usuge

  • a priest for 48.6 years

Source(s):

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 6 May 2017