Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Guy Armand Romano, C.SS.R.

Bishop Emeritus of Niamey


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Jun 1937 BornArc-en-Barrois, France
16 Oct 195619.3ProfessedMember of Congregation of the Most Holy Redeemer
24 Feb 196426.7Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Most Holy Redeemer
25 Jun 198447.0AppointedApostolic Administrator of Niamey, Niger
25 Jun 198447.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Caput Cilla
30 Sep 198447.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Caput Cilla
3 Mar 199759.7AppointedBishop of Niamey, Niger
25 Jan 200365.6ResignedBishop of Niamey, Niger

MicroData Summary for Guy Armand Romano:
Bishop Guy Armand Romano C.SS.R. (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Niamey

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Niamey.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 159, Deceased Cardinals (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.3, 27 Sep 2013; data: 3 Oct 2013