Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Marie-Jean-Baptiste-Hippolyte Berlier, C.SS.R. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Niamey, Niger


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Mar 1919Born
21 Nov 193819.6ProfessedMember of Congregation of the Most Holy Redeemer
4 Aug 194627.4Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Most Holy Redeemer
21 Mar 196142.0AppointedBishop of Niamey, Niger
21 May 196142.1Ordained BishopBishop of Niamey, Niger
25 Jun 198465.2ResignedBishop of Niamey, Niger
22 Sep 199273.5DiedBishop Emeritus of Niamey, Niger

MicroData Summary for Marie-Jean-Baptiste-Hippolyte Berlier
Bishop Marie-Jean-Baptiste-Hippolyte Berlier C.SS.R. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Niamey

EventPlace
Birth PlacePÚlussin, France

  • a priest for 46.1 years
  • a bishop for 31.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 133

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018