Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Djalwana Laurent Lompo

Archbishop of Niamey


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Jan 1967 BornKoulbou
21 Sep 199730.7Ordained PriestPriest of Niamey, Niger
26 Jan 201346.1AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Niamey, Niger
26 Jan 201346.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Buffada
9 Jun 201346.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Buffada
11 Oct 201447.8AppointedArchbishop of Niamey, Niger

MicroData Summary for Djalwana Laurent Lompo:
Archbishop Djalwana Laurent Lompo (born ) Archbishop of Niamey

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Niamey.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 26 Jan 2013
  • ob/c2+: CB, 17 Apr 2013
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 214, Number 17,802
  • ab: Bollettino, 11 Oct 2014

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
Code: web_b, v2.9.9, 5 Oct 2014; Data: 11 Oct 2014