Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jean-Baptiste Kpiéle Somé

Bishop Emeritus of Diébougou, Burkina Faso


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
Sep 1930 Born
11 Apr 195827.6Ordained PriestPriest of Bobo-Dioulasso, Burkina Faso
18 Oct 196838.1AppointedBishop of Diébougou, Burkina Faso
18 Jan 196938.3Ordained BishopBishop of Diébougou, Burkina Faso
3 Apr 200675.5RetiredBishop of Diébougou, Burkina Faso

MicroData Summary for Jean-Baptiste Kpiéle Somé
Bishop Jean-Baptiste Kpiéle Somé (born Sep 1930) Bishop Emeritus of Diébougou

EventPlace
Birth PlaceDano

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Diébougou.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 3 Apr 2006

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 9 Jan 2017