Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Lucas Kalfa Sanou

Bishop of Banfora


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Sep 1951 BornDugona
1 Jul 197826.8Ordained PriestPriest of Bobo-Dioulasso, Burkina Faso
27 Jun 199846.8AppointedBishop of Banfora, Burkina Faso
12 Dec 199847.3Ordained BishopBishop of Banfora, Burkina Faso

MicroData Summary for Lucas Kalfa Sanou:
Bishop Lucas Kalfa Sanou (born ) Bishop of Banfora

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Banfora.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 153, Number 13,449

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013