Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Nouna

Dioecesis Nunensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Joseph Sama, Bishop

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Diocese
  • Split: 14 April 2000
  • Metropolitan: Archdiocese of Bobo-Dioulasso
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Burkina Faso
  • Square Kilometers: 15,000 (5,793 Square Miles)
  • Mailing Address: B.P. 22, Burkina Faso
  • Telephone: 537.005

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Prefecture Apostolic of Nouna
12 June 1947ErectedPrefecture Apostolic of Gao Prefecture Apostolic of Nouna (erected)
Vicariate Apostolic of Nouna
18 October 1951ElevatedPrefecture Apostolic of Nouna Vicariate Apostolic of Nouna
Diocese of Nouna
14 September 1955ElevatedVicariate Apostolic of Nouna Diocese of Nouna
10 April 1962Territory LostDiocese of Nouna Mission "Sui Iuris" of San (erected)
Diocese of Nouna-Dédougou
3 December 1975Name ChangedDiocese of Nouna Diocese of Nouna-Dédougou
14 April 2000SplitDiocese of Nouna-Dédougou Diocese of Dédougou
Diocese of Nouna
Diocese of Nouna
14 April 2000SplitDiocese of Nouna-Dédougou Diocese of Dédougou
Diocese of Nouna

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Prefecture Apostolic of Nouna
19507,390865,500.9%21213517ap1951
Vicariate Apostolic of Nouna
Diocese of Nouna
196951,255560,0009.2%5352105488143012ap1971*
Diocese of Nouna-Dédougou
198055,201699,0007.9%154358951544312ap1981
198772,445789,0009.2%2240621,168555512ap1991
1997112,2681,373,3858.2%4812601,871237814ap2000
Diocese of Nouna
200040,000400,00010.0%149231,7399244ap2001
200153,804414,33613.0%145192,8311065ap2002
200255,418428,84312.9%216272,0521266ap2003
200355,418428,84312.9%195242,3091066ap2004

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.4, 11 Nov 2013; data: 25 Nov 2013