Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joseph Sama

Bishop of Nouna, Burkina Faso


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Oct 1947 Born
12 Jul 197527.7Ordained PriestPriest
14 Apr 200052.5AppointedBishop of Nouna, Burkina Faso
28 Oct 200053.0Ordained BishopBishop of Nouna, Burkina Faso

MicroData Summary for Joseph Sama
Bishop Joseph Sama (born ) Bishop of Nouna

EventPlace
Birth PlaceDédougou

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Nouna.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 161, Number 13,856

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018