Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Césaire-Jean-Hippolyte Esquerre, M. Afr. †

Deceased

Prefect Emeritus of Bobo-Dioulasso, Burkina Faso


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Oct 1885Born
29 Jun 191125.6Ordained PriestPriest of Missionaries of Africa (White Fathers)
11 Jan 192842.2AppointedPrefect of Bobo-Dioulasso, Burkina Faso
18 Jun 193448.6ResignedPrefect of Bobo-Dioulasso, Burkina Faso

MicroData Summary for Césaire-Jean-Hippolyte Esquerre
Father Césaire-Jean-Hippolyte Esquerre M. Afr. (born ) Prefect Emeritus of Bobo-Dioulasso

EventPlace
Birth PlaceOroix, France

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1,933
  • b: Die Apostolische Nachfolge
  • b: Annuaire Pontifical Catholique, Year 1,932

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast