Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Piergiorgio Bertoldi

Apostolic Nuncio to Mozambique

Titular Archbishop of Hispellum


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Jul 1963 Born
11 Jun 198824.8Ordained PriestPriest of Milano {Milan}, Italy
24 Apr 201551.7AppointedTitular Archbishop of Hispellum
24 Apr 201551.7AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Burkina Faso
24 Apr 201551.7AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Niger
2 Jun 201551.8Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Hispellum
19 Mar 201955.6AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Mozambique

MicroData Summary for Piergiorgio Bertoldi
Archbishop Piergiorgio Bertoldi (born ) Apostolic Nuncio of Mozambique

EventPlace
Birth PlaceVarese, Archdiocese of Milano {Milan}, Italy
Ordained PriestCathedral, Milano, Archdiocese of Milano {Milan}, Italy
Ordained BishopSeminario arcivescovile, Basilica, Venegono Inferiore, Archdiocese of Milano {Milan}, Italy

Please contact the Archbishop through the Nunciature to Mozambique.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 24 Apr 2015
  • ob: CB, 24 Apr 2015
  • c2: CB, 13 May 2015
  • c34: CB, 29 May 2015
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 223, Number 18,499
  • loc: AM, 12 Mar 2018
  • ab: Bollettino, 19 Mar 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.4, 3 Mar 2019; Data: 19 Mar 2019

Quantcast