Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Prosper Kontiebo, M.I.

Bishop of Tenkodogo


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Sep 1960 BornBoassa
8 Sep 198424.0ProfessedMember of Order of the Ministers of the Sick
8 Sep 198828.0Professed (Perpetual Vows)Member of Order of the Ministers of the Sick
25 Jun 198928.8Ordained DeaconDeacon of Order of the Ministers of the Sick
7 Jul 199029.8Ordained PriestPriest of Order of the Ministers of the Sick
11 Feb 201251.4AppointedBishop of Tenkodogo, Burkina Faso
2 Jun 201251.7Ordained BishopBishop of Tenkodogo, Burkina Faso

MicroData Summary for Prosper Kontiebo:
Bishop Prosper Kontiebo M.I. (born ) Bishop of Tenkodogo

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Tenkodogo.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 11 Feb 2012
  • ob: CB, 20 Apr 2012
  • perp/od: CB, 2 Jun 2012
  • c2+: CB, 4 Jun 2012
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 210, Number 17,441

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013