Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop David Koudougou

Bishop of Tenkodogo, Burkina Faso


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Aug 1972 Born
14 Jul 200128.9Ordained PriestPriest of Fada N’Gourma, Burkina Faso
11 Feb 201239.5IncardinatedPriest of Tenkodogo, Burkina Faso
Nov 2023²51.2AppointedAdministrator of Tenkodogo, Burkina Faso
6 Feb 202552.5AppointedBishop of Tenkodogo, Burkina Faso
24 May 202552.8Ordained BishopBishop of Tenkodogo, Burkina Faso

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary
David Koudougou
Bishop David Koudougou
(born )
Bishop of Tenkodogo

EventPlace
Birth PlaceTenkodogo
Ordained BishopIn Front of, Maria Regina, Cathedral, Tenkodogo, Diocese of Tenkodogo

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Tenkodogo.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

External Link(s):

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 6 Feb 2025
  • c2+: CB, 24 May 2025

============

Home | Countries | Religious Men Women | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2025
Code: web_b, v3.4.3, 19 May 2025; Data: 25 May 2025