Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joseph Brendan Whelan, C.S.Sp. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Owerri


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 May 1909BornLimerick, Ireland
4 Jul 193728.1Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Holy Spirit
12 Feb 194838.7AppointedVicar Apostolic of Owerri, Nigeria
12 Feb 194838.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Tiddi
25 Apr 194838.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Tiddi
18 Apr 195040.9AppointedBishop of Owerri, Nigeria
25 Jun 197061.1ResignedBishop of Owerri, Nigeria
25 Jun 197061.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Tres Tabernae
10 Aug 197667.2ResignedTitular Bishop of Tres Tabernae
8 Dec 199081.5DiedBishop Emeritus of Owerri, Nigeria

MicroData Summary for Joseph Brendan Whelan:
Bishop Joseph Brendan Whelan C.S.Sp. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Owerri

  • a priest for 53.4 years
  • a bishop for 42.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 125
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1948, Number 37

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013