Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jérôme Owono-Mimboe

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Obala


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Feb 1933BornNgoulémakong
22 Jul 196229.4Ordained PriestPriest
3 Jul 198754.4AppointedBishop of Obala, Cameroon
6 Sep 198754.5Ordained BishopBishop of Obala, Cameroon
3 Dec 200976.8RetiredBishop of Obala, Cameroon
15 Jul 201683.4DiedBishop Emeritus of Obala, Cameroon

MicroData Summary for Jérôme Owono-Mimboe
Bishop Jérôme Owono-Mimboe (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Obala

  • a priest for 53.9 years
  • a bishop for 28.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 3 Dec 2009
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 105, Number 9,157
  • d: CB, 16 Jul 2016

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 16 Jul 2016