Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Doumé-Abong’ Mbang

Dioecesis Dumensis-Abongensis-Mbangensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Jan Ozga, Bishop

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Diocese
  • Name Changed: 17 March 1983
  • Metropolitan: Archdiocese of Bertoua
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Cameroon
  • Square Kilometers: 36,378 (14,051 Square Miles)
  • Official Web Site: http://doume.info/
  • Mailing Address: Eveche, B.P. 42, Doumé, Cameroun
  • Telephone: 00871.762.280.534
  • Fax: 00871.762.280.536

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Vicariate Apostolic of Doumé
3 March 1949ErectedVicariate Apostolic of Yaoundé Vicariate Apostolic of Doumé (erected)
Diocese of Doumé
14 September 1955ElevatedVicariate Apostolic of Doumé Diocese of Doumé
17 March 1983Territory LostDiocese of Doumé Diocese of Bertoua (erected)
Diocese of Doumé-Abong’ Mbang
17 March 1983Name ChangedDiocese of Doumé Diocese of Doumé-Abong’ Mbang

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Vicariate Apostolic of Doumé
195022,129200,00011.1%22527819ap1951
Diocese of Doumé
197061,415274,48422.4%546511,204766821ap1971
198094,952382,50024.8%1439531,791598624ap1981
Diocese of Doumé-Abong’ Mbang
199072,190180,00040.1%109193,799134825ap1991
199971,107248,70728.6%128203,555103613ap2000
200071,409249,50028.6%1313262,746153213ap2001
200184,827250,00033.9%1412263,262143213ap2002
200284,827250,00033.9%2614402,120164813ap2003
2003117,925220,00053.6%2514393,023194613ap2004
200492,646198,30246.7%2014342,724184132ap2005
200695,653206,00046.4%2712392,452155520ap2007

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.0, 19 Jun 2013; data: 10 Jul 2013