Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Lambertus Johannes van Heygen, C.S.Sp. †

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Bertoua


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Dec 1920Born's-Gravenhage
20 Jul 194726.6Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Holy Spirit
16 Apr 196241.4AppointedBishop of Doumé-Abong’ Mbang, Cameroon
29 Jun 196241.6Ordained BishopBishop of Doumé-Abong’ Mbang, Cameroon
17 Mar 198362.3AppointedBishop of Bertoua, Cameroon
11 Nov 199473.9AppointedArchbishop of Bertoua, Cameroon
3 Jun 199978.5RetiredArchbishop of Bertoua, Cameroon
30 May 200786.5DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Bertoua, Cameroon

MicroData Summary for Lambertus Johannes van Heygen:
Archbishop Lambertus Johannes van Heygen C.S.Sp. (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Bertoua

  • a priest for 59.9 years
  • a bishop for 44.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1962, Number 88
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 191, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013