Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Paul Bouque, S.C.I. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Nkongsamba


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Jul 1896BornHauconcourt, France
26 Jul 192529.1Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Priests of the Sacred Heart
28 Oct 193034.3AppointedPrefect of Foumban, Cameroon
28 May 193437.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Vagada
28 May 193437.9AppointedVicar Apostolic of Foumban, Cameroon
21 Nov 193438.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Vagada
14 Sep 195559.2AppointedBishop of Nkongsamba, Cameroon
16 Jun 196467.9ResignedBishop of Nkongsamba, Cameroon
16 Jun 196467.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Abbir Germaniciana
11 Aug 197680.1ResignedTitular Bishop of Abbir Germaniciana
15 Aug 197983.1DiedBishop Emeritus of Nkongsamba, Cameroon

MicroData Summary for Paul Bouque:
Bishop Paul Bouque S.C.I. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Nkongsamba

  • a priest for 54.1 years
  • a bishop for 44.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1934, Number 79

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013