Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pierre Augustin Tchouanga, S.C.I. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Doumé-Abong’ Mbang


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Apr 1928BornBafang
29 Jun 195931.1Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Priests of the Sacred Heart
17 Mar 198354.8AppointedBishop of Doumé-Abong’ Mbang, Cameroon
1 Jun 198355.0Ordained BishopBishop of Doumé-Abong’ Mbang, Cameroon
24 Feb 199566.8ResignedBishop of Doumé-Abong’ Mbang, Cameroon
23 Oct 199971.4DiedBishop Emeritus of Doumé-Abong’ Mbang, Cameroon

MicroData Summary for Pierre Augustin Tchouanga:
Bishop Pierre Augustin Tchouanga S.C.I. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Doumé-Abong’ Mbang

  • a priest for 40.3 years
  • a bishop for 16.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 158, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015