Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Louis-Paul-Armand Simonneaux

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Versailles


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Jan 1916BornServon-sur-Vilaine
10 Mar 194630.1Ordained PriestPriest
30 Sep 196751.7AppointedBishop of Versailles, France
26 Nov 196751.9Ordained BishopBishop of Versailles, France
4 Jun 198872.4ResignedBishop of Versailles, France
22 Jan 200993.0DiedBishop Emeritus of Versailles, France

MicroData Summary for Louis-Paul-Armand Simonneaux:
Bishop Louis-Paul-Armand Simonneaux (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Versailles

  • a priest for 62.9 years
  • a bishop for 41.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: CB
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 160, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 200, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013