Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Thierry Romain Camille Jordan

Archbishop Emeritus of Reims, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
31 Aug 1943 Born
28 Mar 196622.5Ordained DeaconDeacon of Versailles, France
17 Dec 196623.2Ordained PriestPriest of Versailles, France
6 Oct 198744.0AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Pontoise, France
13 Dec 198744.2Ordained BishopCoadjutor Bishop of Pontoise, France
19 Nov 198845.2SucceededBishop of Pontoise, France
20 Jul 199955.8AppointedArchbishop of Reims, France
18 Aug 201874.9RetiredArchbishop of Reims, France

MicroData Summary for Thierry Romain Camille Jordan (VIAF: 167767186)
Archbishop Thierry Romain Camille Jordan (born ) Archbishop Emeritus of Reims

EventPlace
Birth PlaceShanghai, China
Ordained DeaconSt-Joseph des Carmes of Catholic Institute, Chapel, Paris, Archdiocese of Paris
Ordained PriestNotre-Dame, Church, Versailles, Diocese of Versailles
Ordained BishopSaint-Maclou, Cathedral, Pontoise, Diocese of Pontoise

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Reims.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 106, Number 9,266
  • c1: AJ, 8 Nov 2017
  • od/c0/loc: AJ, 3 Jul 2018
  • r: Bollettino, 18 Aug 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 18 Aug 2018

Quantcast