Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joseph Louis Jean Boishu

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Reims

Titular Bishop of Gauriana


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Mar 1939 BornLa Guerche de Bretagne
1 May 196627.1Ordained PriestPriest of Rennes (-Dol-Saint-Malo), France
21 Jan 200363.9AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Reims, France
21 Jan 200363.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Gauriana
27 Apr 200364.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Gauriana
30 Aug 201273.5ResignedAuxiliary Bishop of Reims, France

MicroData Summary for Joseph Louis Jean Boishu:
Bishop Joseph Louis Jean Boishu (born ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Reims

Please contact the Bishop through the Archdiocese of Reims.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 171, Number 14,371
  • r: Bollettino, 30 Aug 2012

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013