Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Bruno Ann-Marie Feillet

Bishop of Sées {Séez}, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Nov 1959 Born
1 Oct 198828.8Ordained PriestPriest of Cambrai, France
28 Jun 201353.6AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Reims, France
28 Jun 201353.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Gaudiaba
22 Sep 201353.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Gaudiaba
17 Jul 202161.6AppointedBishop of Sées {Séez}, France
19 Sep 202161.8InstalledBishop of Sées {Séez}, France

MicroData Summary for Bruno Ann-Marie Feillet
Bishop Bruno Ann-Marie Feillet (born ) Bishop of Sées {Séez}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCaudéran
Ordained BishopNotre-Dame, Cathedral, Reims, Archdiocese of Reims

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Sées {Séez}.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 28 Jun 2013
  • ob: CB, 28 Jun 2013
  • c2+: CB, 25 Jul 2013
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 215, Number 17,881
  • ab: Bollettino, 17 Jul 2021
  • i: CB, 17 Jul 2021

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 17 Jul 2021

Quantcast