Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Vincent Louis Marie Landel, S.C.I. di Béth.

Archbishop of Rabat


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Aug 1941 BornBéth
29 Jun 196927.8Ordained PriestPriest of Priests of the Sacred Heart of Jesus of Bétharram
3 Dec 199958.3AppointedCoadjutor Archbishop of Rabat, Morocco
26 Feb 200058.5Ordained BishopCoadjutor Archbishop of Rabat, Morocco
5 May 200159.7SucceededArchbishop of Rabat, Morocco

MicroData Summary for Vincent Louis Marie Landel:
Archbishop Vincent Louis Marie Landel S.C.I. di Béth. (born ) Archbishop of Rabat

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Rabat.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 158, Number 13,702

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013