Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Domenico De Luca

Deceased

Apostolic Nuncio Emeritus to Morocco

Titular Archbishop of Teglata in Numidia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Jan 1928Born
27 Jul 195224.5Ordained PriestPriest of Napoli {Naples}, Italy
22 May 199365.3AppointedTitular Archbishop of Teglata in Numidia
22 May 199365.3AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Morocco
3 Jul 199365.5Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Teglata in Numidia
17 Jul 200375.5RetiredApostolic Nuncio to Morocco
16 Sep 200678.7DiedApostolic Nuncio Emeritus to Morocco

MicroData Summary for Domenico De Luca
Archbishop Domenico De Luca (born , died ) Apostolic Nuncio Emeritus of Morocco

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSfax, Tunisia

  • a priest for 54.1 years
  • a bishop for 13.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 135, Number 12,117
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 187, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018