Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop René Pierre Louis Joseph Séjourné

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Saint-Flour, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 May 1930Born
7 Oct 195525.3Ordained PriestPriest of Angers, France
17 Jun 198757.0AppointedOfficial of the Roman Curia - Other
17 Jun 198757.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Labicum
5 Sep 198757.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Labicum
13 Sep 199060.3AppointedBishop of Saint-Flour, France
16 Jan 200675.6RetiredBishop of Saint-Flour, France
1 Jun 201888.0DiedBishop Emeritus of Saint-Flour, France

MicroData Summary for René Pierre Louis Joseph Séjourné (VIAF: 4974356)
Bishop René Pierre Louis Joseph Séjourné (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Saint-Flour

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAviré
Ordained BishopSan Pietro, Basilica, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Buried Place (Original)Cemetery, Aviré

  • a priest for 62.6 years
  • a bishop for 30.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 16 Jan 2006
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 105, Number 9,155
  • d: AJ, 2 Jun 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 18 Aug 2018

Quantcast