Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Olivier Michel Marie Schmitthaeusler, M.E.P.

Vicar Apostolic of Phnom-Penh

Titular Bishop of Catabum Castra


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Jun 1970 BornStrasbourg, France
28 Jun 199828.0Ordained PriestPriest of La Société des Missions Etrangères
24 Dec 200939.5AppointedCoadjutor Vicar Apostolic of Phnom-Penh, Cambodia
24 Dec 200939.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Catabum Castra
20 Mar 201039.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Catabum Castra
1 Oct 201040.3SucceededVicar Apostolic of Phnom-Penh, Cambodia

MicroData Summary for Olivier Michel Marie Schmitthaeusler:
Bishop Olivier Michel Marie Schmitthaeusler M.E.P. (born ) Vicar Apostolic of Phnom-Penh

Please contact the Bishop through the Vicariate Apostolic of Phnom-Penh.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 24 Dec 2009
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • s: Bollettino, 1 Oct 2010
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 201, Number 16,594

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013