Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joseph Trân Xuân Tiéu

Bishop of Long Xuyên, Viet Nam


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Aug 1945 Born
10 Aug 197428.9Ordained PriestPriest
3 Jun 199953.7AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Long Xuyên, Viet Nam
29 Jun 199953.8Ordained BishopCoadjutor Bishop of Long Xuyên, Viet Nam
2 Oct 200358.1SucceededBishop of Long Xuyên, Viet Nam

MicroData Summary for Joseph Trân Xuân Tiéu
Bishop Joseph Trân Xuân Tiéu (born ) Bishop of Long Xuyên

EventPlace
Birth PlacePhu Oc Nam Dinh

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Long Xuyên.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 155, Number 13,575
  • c4: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 156, Additions/Corrections (front)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast